Prosser v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jason Prosser
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00240
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Appointing Mediator David L. Brown. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 Selection of David L. Brown as mediator filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 4/30/2021. Motions due by 6/15/2021. This action will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 7/24/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Referred the #15 Rule 26(f) Report to the United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for an order on scheduling. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/2/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #13 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Farm policy) (Lewis, J.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr on behalf of Jason Prosser. (Armstrong, L.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Prosser (Armstrong, Law)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Law Lamar Armstrong, III on behalf of Jason Prosser. (Armstrong, Law)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 7/2/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/8/2020. Copy sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, L. Lamar Armstrong, III of The Armstrong Law Firm, PLLC at 602 S. Third Street, P. O. Box 27, Smithfield, NC 27577 mailed via US Mail. (Waddell, K.)
June 8, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Waddell, K.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed Order granting extension to answer) (Lewis, J.) Modified on 6/8/2020 to correct document description (Waddell, K.).
June 5, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, L. Lamar Armstrong, III of The Armstrong Law Firm, PLLC at 602 S. Third Street, P. O. Box 27, Smithfield, NC 27577 mailed via US Mail on June 5, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Lewis, J.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Johnston County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 1396. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5455574), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Johnston County file, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) (Lewis, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosser v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Prosser
Represented By: L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr.
Represented By: Law Lamar Armstrong, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Diane K. Pappayliou
Represented By: Shelley Walters Coleman
Represented By: J. Scott Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?