Thompson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marlene Thompson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00243
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 7/24/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/26/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul on 7/21/20. (Stouch, L.)
July 10, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Marlene Thompson. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/10/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 8, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
June 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Blair Biser on behalf of Marlene Thompson. (Biser, Jonathan)
June 6, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Marlene Thompson (Biser, Jonathan)
June 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Marlene Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons - Attorney General, #4 Summons - Commissioner, #5 Summons - U.S. Attorney, #6 USM - Attorney General, #7 USM - Commissioner, #8 USM - U.S. Attorney) (Biser, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Thompson
Represented By: Jonathan Blair Biser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?