Summit Hospitality Group, LTD v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Summit Hospitality Group, LTD
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00254
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed by Summit Hospitality Group, LTD. (McDougal, Gregg)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/21/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 21, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This document was filed using a motion event and it is not a motion. The event 'Memorandum in Support' is located under the Response and Replies catagory. Further, pursuant to Section (V)(E)(1) of the CM/ECF Policy Manual, the docket text for the attachment description must be clear andcomplete. Labeling an attachment as Exhibit 1 or Exhibit 1-Affidavit is insufficient. The docket text for an attachment mustprovide a detailed description, such as Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of JaneDoe. Case manager has corrected the docket entry; no further action is needed from counsel. (Stouch, L.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commercial Output Common Policy Declarations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Teleconference Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - CDC COVID-19 Reopening Guidance, #5 Exhibit 5 - CEC News Release) (Baniak, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct document description and add exhibit text (Stouch, L.).
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Baniak, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael P. Baniak on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Baniak, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/9/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 7, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #12 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Stouch, L.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vanore, Andrew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry Denton Worrell on behalf of Summit Hospitality Group, LTD. (Worrell, Henry)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Summit Hospitality Group, LTD (Duke, Lawrence)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Lawrence Russell Duke on behalf of Summit Hospitality Group, LTD. (Duke, Lawrence)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregg E. McDougal on behalf of Summit Hospitality Group, LTD. (McDougal, Gregg)
June 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Cincinnati Insurance Company answer due 7/20/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/17/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 17, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Vanore, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Gregg E. McDougal, H. Denton Worrell and Lawrence R. Duke of McDougal Worrell, LLP at 316 W. Edenton Street, Suite 100, Raleigh, N.C. 27603 mailed via US Mail on June 12, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Notice filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, to Wake County Superior Court. (Vanore, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Vanore, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew A. Vanore, III on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Vanore, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 005560. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5467108), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Summons, Complaint and Letter of Service from Department of Insurance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Vanore, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Hospitality Group, LTD v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Hospitality Group, LTD
Represented By: Henry Denton Worrell
Represented By: Gregg E. McDougal
Represented By: Lawrence Russell Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Vanore, III
Represented By: Michael P. Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?