Diversity Resources Group v. Sauer Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Diversity Resources Group, LLC
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company and Sauer Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2020cv00333
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Collins, S.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Diversity Resources Group, LLC by Sauer Incorporated. (Desmond, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company. (Desmond, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Desmond on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (Desmond, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jessica E. Bowers on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC substituting for Troy Smith and Rachel Cocciolo. (Bowers, Jessica)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support regarding #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index) (Bowers, Jessica)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bowers, Jessica)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Tania Sethi on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Sethi, Tania)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica E. Bowers on behalf of Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Bowers, Jessica)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-CV-333-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/25/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle. Case Number 3:20-cv-00180. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue with directions to the Clerk and counsel for plaintiff; granting #13 Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time as stated in order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/19/2020.(SRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Case Management Report by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Valcorp's Original Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (DRG's Original Answer, Counterclaim, Third-Party Claim, and Crossclaims)), #3 Exhibit C (NGM's Answer, Counterclaim, and Third-Party Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Sauer's Amended Answer and Crossclaims and Sauer's Crossclaim Answer, Counterclaims, and Crossclaims))(Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service executed on 2/28/2020 as to Federal Insurance Company by Diversity Resources Group, LLC (Smith, Troy). Modified on 3/27/2020 to edit text (JSG). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service executed on 3/4/2020 as to Sauer Incorporated by Diversity Resources Group, LLC (Smith, Troy). Modified on 3/27/2020 to edit text (JSG). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time for the defendants to respond to #1 the complaint and for the parties to conduct the case management conference and file the case management report. The defendants must respond to the complaint by June 22, 2020. The parties must conduct the case management conference by July 8, 2020, and file the case management report by July 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/18/2020. (SEJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint by Diversity Resources Group, LLC (Cocciolo, Rachel). Modified on 3/18/2020 to edit event and text (JSG). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Diversity Resources Group, LLC. (Smith, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Diversity Resources Group, LLC (Smith, Troy). Modified on 2/27/2020 to edit text (JSG). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Sauer Incorporated. (JSG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Troy K. Smith of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JSG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-180-J-32PDB. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAUER INCORPORATED (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16521630) filed by Diversity Resources Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Sauer Incorporated, #2 Proposed Summons Federal Insurance Company)(Smith, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diversity Resources Group v. Sauer Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Gina P. Grimsley
Represented By: Robert E. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauer Incorporated
Represented By: Gina P. Grimsley
Represented By: Robert E. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversity Resources Group, LLC
Represented By: Troy K. Smith
Represented By: Rachel Christine Cocciolo
Represented By: Tania Sethi
Represented By: Jessica E. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?