Parker v. Lock et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Neil Parker
Defendant: Karla Beth Denning, Thomas H. Lock and Kristen Ball
Case Number: 5:2020cv00359
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 Order and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jamie Neil Parker. (Collins, S.)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 8/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 7/27/2020. (A copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to Jamie Neil Parker, 202 Charlie Rd., Four Oaks, NC 27524.) (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jamie Neil Parker. (Rudd, D.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jamie Neil Parker. (Rudd, D.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Lock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Neil Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Beth Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Lock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?