Monaco v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ivette Monaco
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00406
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ivette Monaco (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hemmings, Aaron)
September 1, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative to Stay filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Whole Life Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Loguidice Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loguidice Docket, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Walton, Victor)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ivette Monaco (Hemmings, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kenneth Jay Grunfeld on behalf of Ivette Monaco. (Grunfeld, Kenneth)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Aaron C. Hemmings on behalf of Ivette Monaco. (Hemmings, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Aaron C. Hemmings on behalf of Ivette Monaco. (Hemmings, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron C. Hemmings on behalf of Ivette Monaco. (Hemmings, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Notice of Special Appearance, #12 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joseph M. Brunner on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Brunner, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Richardson on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Eric)
July 29, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including August 31, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/29/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
July 29, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed. (Stouch, L.)
July 29, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Andrew Jones on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Jones, Mark)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company of Filing State Court Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Notice) (Walton, Victor)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Walton, Victor)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gerber Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Western and Southern Life Insurance Company for Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Walton, Victor)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Victor A. Walton, Jr on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Walton, Victor)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff Aaron C. Hemmings of Hemmings & Stevens PLLC at 5540 McNeely Drive, Suite 202, Raleigh, NC 27612; Kenneth J. Grunfeld of Golomb & Honik at 1835 Market Street, Suite 2900, Philadelphia, PA 19103; J. Gerard Stranch, IV of Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC at 223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200, Nashville, TN 37203; Jeffrey D. Kaliel of Kaliel PLLC at 1875 Connecticut Avenue, NW, 10th Floor, Washington, D.C. 20009 and Lynn A. Toops of Cohen & Malad, LLP at One Indiana Square, Suite 1400, Indianapolis, IN 46204 mailed via US Mail on July 27, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
July 27, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Gerber Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 27, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gerber Life Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20CVS06890. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5534465), filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of L Moore, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Walton, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monaco v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor A. Walton, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Jones
Represented By: Eric W. Richardson
Represented By: Joseph M. Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette Monaco
Represented By: Aaron C. Hemmings
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?