Almaharmeh et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Almaharmeh and Amer Almaharmeh
Defendant: Acting Dir. - USCIS KENNETH CUCCINELLI, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Director Jay R Weselmann, Director Christopher Wray, District Director Sarah Taylor, Field OfficeDirector Greg Collett, Jay R Weselmann, Chad Wolf, Greg Collett, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Christopher Wray and Sarah Taylor
Case Number: 5:2020cv00421
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Greg Collett, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Sarah Taylor, Jay R Weselmann, Chad Wolf, Christopher Wray. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Complaint. Counsel indicated the incorrect division. In future filings, please reference the Western Division in the case caption. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Amer Almaharmeh, Jessica Almaharmeh Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) (Baloch, Mohammad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Amer Almaharmeh, Jessica Almaharmeh (Baloch, Mohammad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammad Omar Baloch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Baloch, Mohammad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WRIT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number RAL079887.), filed by Jessica Almaharmeh, Amer Almaharmeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - I-130 Approval Notice dated July 16, 2012, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - US Department of Justice Order of the Immigration Judge Terminating Removal Proceedings dated August 14, 2012, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - I-485 Receipt dated January 13, 2014, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 4Interview Notice for I-485 on August 7, 2014, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Request for additional Evidence and Response to Request for Additional Evidence, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Properly filed AR-11s by Plaintiffs on September 4, 2015, December 8, 2016, and October 10, 2017, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Telephonic Inquiry to USCIS dated December 28, 2018, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Telephonic Inquiry to USCIS dated November 15, 2019, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Senatorial Inquiry Performed by the Honorable Richard Burr on December 21, 2016, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Senatorial Inquiry Performed by the Honorable Richard Burr on May 28, 2019, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Senatorial Inquiry Performed by the Honorable Richard Burr on June 10, 2019, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Congressional Inquiry Performed by the Honorable David Price on September 30, 2019, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Congressional Inquiry Performed by the Honorable David Price on October 2, 2019, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Congressional Inquiry Performed by the Honorable David Price on January 9, 2020, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - USCIS Ombudsmans Requests dated March, 20, 2019, April 22, 2019, May 21, 2019, June 25, 2019, July 25, 2019, August 20, 2019, October 2, 2019, December 2, 2019, and March 20, 2020) (Baloch, Mohammad) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Collins, S.).
August 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Notice of Appearance. Wrong events used. The Notice of Appearance and Financial Disclosure Statements are stand alone events and shall be refiled using those events. Counsel shall also refile the Complaint, attaching as separate pdf exhibits all of the exhibits (previously filed together at DE1-2) and which are attached to this docket entry. Counsel shall refile the proposed summonses using the event Notice-Other. Finally, counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). When refiling the exhibits descriptions should match the descriptions contained on the exhibit list. Counsel is strongly advised to review all applicable policies, procedures, and rules with regard to filing through CM/ECF, which are found on our website. Any member of your staff who files through CM/ECF on your behalf must have had proper training before any filing attempt. (Collins, S.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammad Omar Baloch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Financial Disclosure, #2 Exhibit List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Proposed Summons Summons, #19 Proposed Summons Summons, #20 Proposed Summons Summons, #21 Proposed Summons Summons, #22 Proposed Summons Summons, #23 Proposed Summons Summons, #24 Proposed Summons Summons, #25 Proposed Summons Summons, #26 Proposed Summons Summons) (Baloch, Mohammad)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to flatten the PDF after creating it as required pursuant to Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is directed to refile the Proposed Summons making sure to comply with the rule. (Rudd, D.)
August 10, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Amer Almaharmeh, Jessica Almaharmeh. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel did not properly file exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five exhibits, the first attached exhibit must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. Counsel is directed to refile the exhibits describing each exhibit. (Rudd, D.)
August 10, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL079887 (Rodriguez, M.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 **REFILED AT #3 ** COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Amer Almaharmeh, Jessica Almaharmeh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons) (Baloch, Mohammad) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Collins, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almaharmeh et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Almaharmeh
Represented By: Mohammad Omar Baloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amer Almaharmeh
Represented By: Mohammad Omar Baloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir. - USCIS KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Jay R Weselmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field OfficeDirector Greg Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R Weselmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?