United States of America v. $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Orlando Dickens
Case Number: 5:2020cv00471
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Verified CLAIM by Orlando Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 USM 285 Form - Funds in USMS Custody on 9/28/20. (Stouch, L.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT of of Arrest and Notice in Rem issued. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Clerk of Court, on 9/14/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 14, 2020 Remark - #4 Notice referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Stouch, L.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of United States of America. (Fesak, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORRECTED COMPLAINT (Corrected Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem) against $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Task Force Officer Phillip Lewis, US Drug Enforcement Administration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 REFIED AT DE #2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Task Force Officer Phillip Lewis, US Drug Enforcement Administration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 9/4/2020 to clarify docket text. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $73,300.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Orlando Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?