Aberg v. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC
Plaintiff: Daniel A Aberg
Defendant: VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00502
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 12/2/2020. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/4/2020. Sent to Daniel A Aberg at 30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 2, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Sellers, N.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel A Aberg. (Stouch, L.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel A Aberg (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/1/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Daniel A Aberg 30 East Landing, Sanford, NC 27332. (Stouch, L.)
September 30, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance and a Notice of Self Representation mailed via Daniel A. Aberg30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 mailed via US Mail on September 28, 20209 along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Fowler, Neal)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (Omitted Attachment - Summons & Complaint - Cumberland County). (Fowler, Neal)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC from District Court Division - Small Claims - Cumberland County, case number 20 CVM 3948., filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to the Clerk of Cumberland County) (Fowler, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aberg v. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A Aberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?