Moore et al v. Circosta et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Heath, Timothy K. Moore, Maxine Whitley, Philip E. Berger and Alan Swain
Defendant: Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, III, Karen Brinson Bell and Damon Circosta
Intervenor Defendant: Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, John P. Clark, Becky Johnson, Regina Whitney Edwards, Democracy North Carolina, Margaret B. Cates, Caren Rabinowitz, Robert K. Priddy, II, Sandra Malone, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Barker Fowler, Walter Hutchins and Lelia Bentley
Case Number: 5:2020cv00507
Filed: September 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2020 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #49 Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (McGirr, M.)
October 11, 2020 Filing 49 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE held on Monday, September 28, 2020, before United States District Judge James C. Dever III. Court Reporter ~ Michelle McGirr. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website Redaction Request due 11/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021. (McGirr, M.)
October 5, 2020 Remark - Case opened in North Carolina Middle District as case 1:20-cv-911, filed 10/5/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2020 Case transferred to Middle District of North Carolina. File transmitted electronically. (Stouch, L.)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and transferring case to the Honorable William L. Osteen, Jr., USDC, MDNC.Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/3/2020. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/3/2020. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
October 2, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held in Raleigh, NC before District Judge James C. Dever, III: Hearing held on 10/2/2020. Counsel present in courtroom and by videoconference. Oral argument held. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Stouch, L.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 45 Notice filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta Notice of Filing of State Court Consent Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Judgment Entered in Wake County 20-CVS-8881) (Peters, Alexander)
October 2, 2020 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance filed by Hilary Harris Klein on behalf of Lelia Bentley, Margaret B. Cates, John P. Clark, Democracy North Carolina, Regina Whitney Edwards, Walter Hutchins, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, Robert K. Priddy, II. (Klein, Hilary)
October 2, 2020 Filing 43 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Sarah G. Boyce on behalf of All Defendants. (Boyce, Sarah)
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by Burton Craige on behalf of Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Craige, Burton)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Setting Hearings - Hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 05:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 10/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Philip E. Berger, Bobby Heath, Timothy K. Moore, Alan Swain, Maxine Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 1 Numbered Memo 2020-27, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Moss, Nicole)
October 1, 2020 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by League of Women Voters of North Carolina (Riggs, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Filing 38 Financial Disclosure Statement by Democracy North Carolina (Riggs, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Jean Riggs on behalf of Lelia Bentley, Margaret B. Cates, John P. Clark, Democracy North Carolina, Regina Whitney Edwards, Walter Hutchins, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, Robert K. Priddy, II. (Riggs, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support regarding #35 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lelia Bentley, Margaret B. Cates, John P. Clark, Democracy North Carolina, Regina Whitney Edwards, Walter Hutchins, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, Robert K. Priddy, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: PI Order in Democracy N.C., #2 Exhibit 2: Original Numbered Memo 2020-19, #3 Exhibit 3: Revised Numbered Memo 2020-19, #4 Exhibit 4: Redline of Numbered Memo 2020-19, #5 Exhibit 5: Status Conference Order in Democracy N.C., #6 Exhibit 6: Proposed Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO, #7 Exhibit 7: Intervenor-Defendant Declarations, #8 Exhibit 8: Letters re Cure Process) (Riggs, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene filed by Democracy North Carolina, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, Lelia Bentley, Margaret B. Cates, Robert K. Priddy, II, Regina Whitney Edwards, John P. Clark, Walter Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1: Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss) (Riggs, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Uzoma N. Nkwonta on behalf of Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 1, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Marc E. Elias on behalf of Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Elias, Marc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20202-0-20 Emergency Executive Order, #2 Exhibit Numbered Memo 2020-14, #3 Exhibit Raymond and Black Resignation Letters, #4 Exhibit 2020-09-15 Bench Memo, #5 Exhibit News and Observer Article) (Peters, Alexander)
October 1, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Oposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Attachments: #1 Intervenors' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Uzoma Nwonta, #3 Exhibit 1 -- DeJoy Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 -- USPS Letter, #5 Exhibit 3 -- NC Alliance Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 -- DNC v. Bostelmann Order, #7 Exhibit 5 -- Martel Order, #8 Exhibit 6 -- Hearing Transcript, #9 Exhibit 7 -- Opposition to Consent Judgment, #10 Exhibit 8 -- Memo 2020-14, #11 Exhibit 9 -- Stringer Brief, #12 Exhibit 10 -- Memo 2020-19, #13 Exhibit 11 -- Bullock Order) (Ghosh, Narendra)
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Narendra K. Ghosh on behalf of Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Ghosh, Narendra)
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support regarding #27 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Caren Rabinowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment) (Ghosh, Narendra)
September 30, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans, Barker Fowler, Becky Johnson, Jade Jurek, Rosalyn Kociemba, Tom Kociemba, Sandra Malone, Caren Rabinowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Proposed Answer) (Ghosh, Narendra)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The court DENIES defendants' motion to transfer venue [D.E. 14]. Defendants may submit a response to plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order by 9:00 A.M. on Thursday, October 1, 2020. Plaintiffs may reply to defendants' response by 9:00 A.M. on Friday, October 2, 2020. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 9/30/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 Notice filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta regarding #24 Notice - other of Filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 9-22-20 Email from Katelyn Love, #2 Exhibit 2 9-24-20 Email from Heather Ford) (Peters, Alexander)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 Notice filed by Philip E. Berger, Bobby Heath, Timothy K. Moore, Alan Swain, Maxine Whitley regarding #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Linda Devore) (Moss, Nicole)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta. (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of All Defendants. (Steed, Terence)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Philip E. Berger, Bobby Heath, Timothy K. Moore, Alan Swain, Maxine Whitley. (Moss, Nicole)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 Notice filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta of Filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Filing in Democracy NC v. NCSBE) (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held in Raleigh, NC before District Judge James C. Dever, III: Status Conference held on 9/28/2020. All counsel present by videoconference. (Court Reporter Michelle McGirr) (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL080905. (Agiovlassitis, J.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:20-CV-507-D. No further filings should be made in 4:20-CV-182-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Hearings - Status Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:30 AM in Raleigh by video conference in the 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 9/28/2020. The Clerk's office will contact counsel via email with video conference instructions. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Related Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA . (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter to Elaine Marshall) (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA. (Peters, Alexander)
September 27, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Alexander McClure Peters on behalf of All Defendants. (Peters, Alexander)
September 26, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Patterson, Peter)
September 26, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by David H. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, David)
September 26, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Andrew Huff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Huff, Nathan)
September 26, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, BOBBY HEATH, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, ALAN SWAIN, MAXINE WHITLEY. (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, BOBBY HEATH, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, ALAN SWAIN, MAXINE WHITLEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by ALAN SWAIN (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by MAXINE WHITLEY (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by BOBBY HEATH (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by PHILIP E. BERGER (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by TIMOTHY K. MOORE (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole Jo Moss on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by BOBBY HEATH, PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, MAXINE WHITLEY, ALAN SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Motion for Consent Judgment in 20CVS8881 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. Sept. 22, 2020), #3 Exhibit 2 - Board of Elections Consent Judgment Press Release (Sept. 22, 2020), #4 Exhibit 3 - Numbered Memo 2020-19 (Aug. 21, 2020), #5 Exhibit 4 - Board of Elections Letter (Mar. 26, 2020), #6 Exhibit 5 - Hearing Transcript in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC July 21, 2020), #7 Exhibit 6 - Resignation Letter of David Black (Sept. 23, 2020), #8 Exhibit 7 - Resignation Letter of Ken Raymond (Sept. 23, 2020), #9 Exhibit 8 - Rules Review Commission Meeting Minutes (May 21, 2020), #10 Exhibit 9 - Amend. Compl. in 20-CVS-8881 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. Aug. 18, 2020), #11 Exhibit 10 - Amend. Compl. in 20-CVS-05615 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. July 8, 2020), #12 Exhibit 11 - Second Amend. Compl. in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC June 18, 2020), #13 Exhibit 12 - Decl. of Tomas Lopez in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC June 18, 2020), #14 Proposed Summons Damon Circosta, #15 Proposed Summons Stella Anderson, #16 Proposed Summons Jeff Carmon III, #17 Proposed Summons Karen Brinson Bell, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moss, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Circosta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Heath
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy K. Moore
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Whitley
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip E. Berger
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Swain
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Sarah G. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon, III
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Sarah G. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Sarah G. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Circosta
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Sarah G. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Jade Jurek
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rosalyn Kociemba
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tom Kociemba
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: John P. Clark
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Becky Johnson
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Regina Whitney Edwards
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Democracy North Carolina
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Margaret B. Cates
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Caren Rabinowitz
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Robert K. Priddy, II
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sandra Malone
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: League of Women Voters of North Carolina
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: North Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Barker Fowler
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Burton Craige
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Walter Hutchins
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Lelia Bentley
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?