North Plate Semiconductor, LLC v. ABB, Inc.
Plaintiff: North Plate Semiconductor, LLC
Defendant: ABB INC. and ABB, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00567
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by ABB, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABB Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Holdings, Inc. for ABB, Inc.. (Moye, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by John M. Moye on behalf of ABB, Inc.. (Moye, John)
November 5, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Tripp, S.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on October 30, 2020. (Tripp, S.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ABB, Inc. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.* (Tripp, S.)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn G. Cole on behalf of North Plate Semiconductor, LLC. (Cole, Kathryn)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by John Mark Wilson on behalf of North Plate Semiconductor, LLC. (Wilson, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Plate Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Markman Advisors, LLC for North Plate Semiconductor, LLC. (Wilson, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABB INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5694987.), filed by North Plate Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6617641, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 6620653, #3 Exhibit C - ABB Inc. Product Brochure for Power Semiconductors, 2018, #4 Exhibit D - EDN IGBT Tutorial Part I, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons) (Wilson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Plate Semiconductor, LLC v. ABB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Plate Semiconductor, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Wilson
Represented By: Kathryn G. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?