Riethmiller
Plaintiff: Annamarie Riethmiller
Case Number: 5:2020cv00606
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Attachments: #1 Additional motion document, #2 Affidavit of Annamarie Doroetha Riethmiller, #3 Notice of Service of parties to join) (Collins, S.)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Removal of Manatee County, Florida Case to this District Court filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Manatee County, Florida court documents) (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION for Joinder filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Urgent motion, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Manatee envelope, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Manatee envelope, #4 Exhibit D - Invoice, #5 Exhibit E - Invoice, #6 Exhibit F - Handwritten note, #7 For FBI and IRS Appendix, #8 Affidavit) (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Response of the Ex Parte Petitioner to This Court's Order dated 11/20/20 by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Attachments: #1 Copy of deficiency order, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE URGENT MOTION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2020 Motions Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #5 EX PARTE MOTION by Annamarie Riethmiller, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/20/2020. (A copy of this Order, pro se litigant brochure and blank civil summons forms were sent via US mail to Annamarie Riethmiller, 1009 Delma Grimes Rd., Coats, NC 27521.) (Collins, S.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Rudd, D.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Rudd, D.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Annamarie Riethmiller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2SEALED - Copy of Florida driver's license, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.) Modified on 12/3/2020 to seal exhibit 2 pursuant to directive from chambers. (Collins, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riethmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamarie Riethmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?