UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jones
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Patrick Jones
Case Number: 5:2020hc02117
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18:4241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - GRANTING #8 Motion and Todd Cesar may testify by video. The government's counsel is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on Cesar. The motion #9 to allow witness to testify by telephone is ALLOWED. Coordination of that telephone call with the court must be made by respondent's counsel through the court's Information Technology Specialist Glenna Falk sufficiently prior to the hearing. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/21/2020. (Poole, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION SUBPOENA OF WITNESSES filed by Patrick Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Craven, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Patrick Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Set of Interrogatories to the Petitioner) (Craven, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Patrick Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Production of Documents) (Craven, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice filed by Patrick Jones Notice of Admissions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admissions) (Craven, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to allow witness to testify by telephone filed by Patrick Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Craven, James)
July 27, 2020 Motion No Longer Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: regarding #8 MOTION SUBPOENA OF WITNESSES. (Poole, A)
July 24, 2020 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #8 MOTION SUBPOENA OF WITNESSES. (Poole, A)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION SUBPOENA OF WITNESSES filed by Patrick Jones. (Craven, James)
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #7 Notice - other. The incorrect event has been selected. Counsel is directed to refile the document using the event Miscellaneous Relief. (Poole, A)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Patrick Jones (MOTION FOR SUBPOENA OF WITNESSES). (Craven, James)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Patrick Jones additional mental health examiner. (Craven, James)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by James Braxton Craven, III on behalf of Patrick Jones. (Craven, James)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order appointing Federal Public Defender to represent respondent, appointing additional mental health examiner, and granting #3 motion to seal. Competency Hearing set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. The court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal, whether such documents are produced by government evaluators, independent examiners appointed by order of this court, or other mental health professionals. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 6/26/2020. (Poole, A)
June 25, 2020 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report. (Poole, A)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED(Selected Participants Only) Forensic Report received as to Patrick Jones (available to: Respondent Patrick Jones, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Petre, Genna) Modified on 7/1/2020 to remove "proposed" (Poole, A).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 against Patrick Jones, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Jones
Represented By: James Braxton Craven, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?