UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Wayda
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Sean Michael Wayda
Case Number: 5:2020hc02180
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18:4248
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Continue December 8, 2020 Motions Hearing filed by Sean Michael Wayda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Craven, Joseph)
November 19, 2020 ****Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 11:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Poole, A)
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION filed by Sean Michael Wayda. (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
November 13, 2020 ****Set Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Poole, A)
November 5, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION, #20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding United States' Response in Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Certificate [D.E. 19]. (Poole, A)
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding United States' Response in Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Certificate [D.E. 19] filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joseph Zonno, #2 Decl. Attachment 1 - Inmate History, #3 Decl. Attachment 2 - Designation History) (Petre, Genna)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Sean Wayda regarding case. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Sean Wayda regarding his court case and attorney. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION. Responses due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/29/2020. (Poole, A)
October 29, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020, MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION. (Poole, A)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay hold evaluations and deadlines in abeyance until further notice from the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/9/2020. (Poole, A)
October 9, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION. (Poole, A)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Sean Michael Wayda (available to: Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Respondent Sean Michael Wayda). (Attachments: #1 Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Dawn Graney, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner, #2 Addendum to Dr. Graney's Forensic Evaluation, #3 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Dawn Graney) (Royster, Joshua)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal #11 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, filed by Sean Michael Wayda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Jaclyn L. Tarlton (available to: Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Respondent Sean Michael Wayda) regarding #10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020 MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delaware Detainer; Exhibit B -Pennsylvania Docket) (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss CERTIFICATE OF 9/24/2020, MOTION to Stay HOLD EVALUATIONS AND DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISPOSITION OF THIS MOTION filed by Sean Michael Wayda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Hold Evaluations and Deadlines in Abeyance, #2 Text of Proposed Order Dismiss Certificate) (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jaclyn L. Tarlton on behalf of Sean Michael Wayda. (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jaclyn L. Tarlton on behalf of Sean Michael Wayda. (Tarlton, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph H. Craven on behalf of Sean Michael Wayda. (Craven, Joseph)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This case is a proceeding by the government under 18 U.S.C. 4248 for the civil commitment of respondent as a sexually dangerous person. The court's Standing Order on such cases, No. 13-S0-2 (E.D.N.C. 21 Oct. 2013), shall govern proceedings in this case, except to the extent that it is inconsistent with the undersigned's Judicial Preference Order 12-JP-1. The deadlines and other provisions that shall therefore apply in this case are included in this order. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/7/2020. Counsel is reminded to read the entire order for critical dates and deadlines. (Poole, A)
September 29, 2020 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Poole, A)
September 29, 2020 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:20-HC-2180-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/29/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Royster, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Petre, Genna)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Bredenberg on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bredenberg, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Royster, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against Sean Michael Wayda, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Jamie Hersant), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Wayda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Represented By: Michael D. Bredenberg
Represented By: Joshua B. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sean Michael Wayda
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Tarlton
Represented By: Joseph H. Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?