Suri v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Bill Suri
Defendant: Warden Craig Apker, L. Lindsley, John Doe Warden #3, John Doe Warden #2, Carlos Duchesne, Dr. Kevin Pigos, Dr. P. Chopra, Bureau of Prisons (BOP), Dr. Adrian Ogle, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Administrator John Doe Camp, BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10, Roscoe Ramsey, John Doe and John Doe Warden #1
Case Number: 5:2021ct03108
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Case transferred in from Western Division on 04/23/2021. Case Number 5:21-cv-185. (Tripp, S.)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER - At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above captioned case is reassigned to the below noted case number. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of: 5:21-CT-3108-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/23/2021. (Tripp, S.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 66 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 65 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern. Case Number 1:19-cv-00803. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred electronically to the Eastern District-North Carolina Court pursuant to Electronic Order dtd. 4/21/2021 by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Case reopened pursuant to Electronic Order dtd. 4/21/2021. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: By letter #63 dated April 9, 2020, Plaintiff requested that the Court's judgment #61 be amended to transfer Plaintiff's remaining Bivens claims to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Defendants consent to this request #64 . Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to reopen this case and transfer this action to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/21/2021. (Williams, Erica)[Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 11, 2021 Filing 64 REPLY in Support Of Motion To Transfer Case filed by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 63 Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #61 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, Order on Motion to Set Aside,, #62 Clerk's Judgment by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 62 JUDGMENT, that Defendants' 12(b)(1) motion is granted; and that Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, by J. Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 3/31/2021. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction #56 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. Defendants' motion #59 to set aside Plaintiffs supplemental letter is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 3/31/2021. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 First MOTION to Set Aside Plaintiff's Out-Of.Time Brief filed by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 59 First MOTION to Set Aside Plaintiff's Out-Of.Time Brief by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 4, 2020, before Judge DeArcy Hall. Court Transcriber: Aria Services, Inc., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Email address: aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 7/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2020. (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for pre motion conference Second Supplemental Response filed by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 56 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for pre motion conference Supplemental Response filed by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: A telephonic pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss was held on June 4, 2020, before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. John Kaley and David Rivera appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Kevin Cleary; and law student, Margaret Rivera appeared on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff is directed to file a supplemental submission, on or before June 9, 2020, addressing the issue of whether correspondence in lieu of Form 95 is sufficient to satisfy the FTCAs exhaustion requirement. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed on or before June 10, 2020. The parties' submissions shall not exceed three (3) pages in length. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 6/5/2020. (FTR Log #Audio Telephone Conference.) (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 13, 2020 regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is adjourned to June 4, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call 1-888-684-8852 and use the access code 1537693. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/12/2020. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #54 Motion for Discovery; granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: The schedule set during the conference held on 8/14/2019 as well as the settlement conference set for June 4th are held in abeyance pending a decision on the anticipated motion to dismiss or a ruling by the District Court that discovery proceed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/29/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Discovery Stay Of Discovery Until Parties's Respective Motions Are Decided, Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant United States of America's request for a pre-motion conference regarding its anticipated motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Court shall hold a pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss on May 13, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. In order to protect public health, and reduce the size of public gatherings and unnecessary travel, the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 13, 2020, shall be held telephonically. The parties are directed to call 1-888-684-8852 and use the access code 1537693. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/10/2020. (Williams, Erica) Modified on 4/10/2020 (Williams, Erica). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order The Court adjourns the settlement conference scheduled for April 2, 2020 to 11:00 a.m. on June 4, 2020 in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing of the Brooklyn Courthouse. Counsel are to submit their settlement positions, which were due on March 30th, by June 1, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/1/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Bill Suri. (Rivera, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: In direct contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiff failed to respond to Defendant United Stated of America's request for a pre-motion conference regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss #51 . Plaintiff is directed to file a letter responding to Defendants' request, or indicating that he does not intend to oppose Defendant's motion. Any letter response must not exceed three pages and must be filed on or before February 20, 2020. Failure to abide by this order may result in the issuance of sanctions, including dismissal for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 2/19/2020. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that all claims against Defendant Carlos Duchesne are dismissed. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 2/11/2020. (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for pre motion conference by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rivera on behalf of Bill Suri (aty to be noticed) (Rivera, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 9, 2020 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal Of All Claims Against Dr. Carlos Duchesne by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 48 DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT CRAIG APKER THAT HE HAS NO NEW YORK CONTACTS by United States of America (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT ROSCOE RAMSEY THAT HE HAS NO NEW YORK CONTACTS by United States of America (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT LIZ LINDSLEY THAT SHE HAS NO NEW YORK CONTACTS by United States of America (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION THAT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO FILE AN FTCA ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 44 DECLARATION Of Carlos Duchesne That He Is A Commissioned Officer In the US Public Health Service by United States of America (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bureau of Prisons (BOP) answer due 2/18/2020; P. Chopra answer due 2/18/2020; Adrian Ogle answer due 2/18/2020; Kevin Pigos answer due 2/18/2020; Roscoe Ramsey answer due 2/18/2020; United States of America answer due 2/18/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/9/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) Modified on 1/9/2020 (Vasquez, Lea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT And Certificate of Merit against BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10, Bureau of Prisons (BOP), Roscoe Ramsey, United States of America, L. Lindsley, Carlos Duchesne, Craig Apker, filed by Bill Suri, L. Lindsley, Carlos Duchesne, Craig Apker. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 02/13/2020)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: The time to amend the complaint is extended to January 3, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/3/2019. (Huber, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: The time to amend the complaint is extended to December 4, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/18/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 40 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend: The time for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is extended from October 30, 2019 to November 20, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/25/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 39 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 38 Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Kaley & Rivera for Plaintiff; Cleary for Defendants. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 9/9/19; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 10/15/19; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 10/30/19; All fact discovery to be completed by 4/30/20; Exchange of expert reports - 6/1/20; Expert depositions completed by - 7/1/20; All discovery completed by - 7/30/20. An in-person settlement conference will be held on April 2, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than March 30, 2020. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (FTR Log #10:22 - 10:48.) (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 37 Letter to Magistrate Judge Tiscione Submitting Discovery Plan Worksheet by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 Dr. Ramsey's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roscoe Ramsey. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #34 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The time for Defendants to file a consolidate answer is extended to August 1, 2019. The initial conference scheduled for August 12th will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on August 14, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/15/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 34 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Second Motion To Adjourn Date To Answer by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on August 12, 2019 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than August 8th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/8/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 Letter in Response to June 13, 2019 Order by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bureau of Prisons (BOP) answer due 7/15/2019; P. Chopra answer due 7/15/2019; Adrian Ogle answer due 7/15/2019; Kevin Pigos answer due 7/15/2019; Roscoe Ramsey answer due 7/15/2019; United States of America answer due 7/15/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/20/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint by United States of America. (Cleary, Kevan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. John Doe Warden #3 served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation of discontinuance as to Defendant Adrian Ogle #28 , Defendant Ogle's motions seeking a pre-motion conference #15 , and to withdraw his motion seeking a pre-motion conference #21 are TERMINATED as moot. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 6/14/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. P. Chopra served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff shall electronically file a status by 7/3/2019 indicating how it intends to proceed with respect to the remaining defendants who have been served with the summons and complaint but did not answer before the deadline expired. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/13/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Discontinuance by Adrian Ogle (Brennan., Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File: The time for Plaintiff to serve Defendant Jeff Thomas with the summons and complaint is extended to June 20th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/4/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 27 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavits in Connection with Service of Complaint by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. John Doe Camp served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. John Doe Warden #3 served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. Roscoe Ramsey served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Adrian Ogle to answer, move or otherwise respond to June 7, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/15/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by Adrian Ogle. (Brennan., Timothy) Modified on 5/15/2019 (Vasquez, Lea). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 Letter MOTION to Withdraw #15 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Adrian Ogle. (Brennan., Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. John Doe Warden #1 served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. P. Chopra served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brennan. on behalf of Adrian Ogle (notification declined or already on case) (Brennan., Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Adrian Ogle. (Brennan., Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to June 6th to Effectuate service upon the Defendants indicated in Plaintiff's letter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/7/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavits in Connection with Service of Complaint by Bill Suri. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. Adrian Ogle served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. Kevin Pigos served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. Bureau of Prisons (BOP) served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to John Doe Camp, John Doe, John Doe Warden #1, John Doe Warden #2, John Doe Warden #3. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Bill Suri (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Suri. United States of America served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Kaley, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 8, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653136962 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Bill Suri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suri v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Craig Apker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lindsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Warden #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Warden #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Duchesne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kevin Pigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. P. Chopra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons (BOP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Adrian Ogle
Represented By: Timothy S. Brennan.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kevan Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator John Doe Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roscoe Ramsey
Represented By: Kevan Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Warden #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Suri
Represented By: David Rivera
Represented By: Anthony Cecutti
Represented By: John F. Kaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?