Fisher v. Reardon et al
Plaintiff: Darrel R. Fisher
Defendant: Maureen Lyons Reardon, Judge W. Earl Britt and Sarah Ralston
Case Number: 5:2021ct03186
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including September 15, 2021 for plaintiff to comply with the order of deficiency. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/11/2021. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 11, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Indig, A.)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Prepare Petition filed by Darrel R. Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #4 Order of Deficiency. Responses due by 8/16/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/8/2021. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Order of Deficiency filed by Darrel R. Fisher. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Order of Deficiency. (Indig, A.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. Response due by 7/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/25/2021. Copy of order and form sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Darrel R. Fisher at Butner - F.M.C. (Indig, A.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Darrel R. Fisher. (Indig, A.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. Earl Britt, Sarah Ralston and Maureen Lyons Reardon filed by Darrel R. Fisher. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Reardon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Lyons Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge W. Earl Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Ralston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?