Thomas v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Arnett Thomas
Defendant: Robin Jackson, Officer M. Jackson and Tucson Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2021ct03239
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
September 8, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Case Submitted for initial review. (Indig, A.)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/12/2021. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Butner FMC. (Indig, A.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Arnett Thomas. (Indig, A.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Jackson, Robin Jackson and Tucson Medical Center filed by Arnett Thomas. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnett Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucson Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?