Bussie v. House Speaker et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Bussie
Defendant: House Speaker, Webster Earl Britt and Warden Scarantino
Case Number: 5:2021ct03265
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing plaintiff to correct deficiency. Response to order due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/2/2021. Copy served via US Mail, along with form: Anthony Bussie 64105-050, Butner - F.M.C., P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. (Castania, M)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to plaintiff regarding transfer of case. (Castania, M)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern. Case Number 1:21-cv-22725. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens; Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to Bivens against Webster Earl Britt, House Speaker, Scarantino. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Anthony Bussie.(daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussie v. House Speaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bussie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House Speaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster Earl Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Scarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?