Taylor v. United States Marshal et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Lamont Taylor
Defendant: United States Marshal, United States Marshall Aaron and United States Marshall Michale
Case Number: 5:2021ct03312
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court DENIES Taylor's motions [D.E. 3, 4] without prejudice, but DIRECTS the clerk to ensure that the transferee court has received the file. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/2/2021. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Document: "Memorandum Affidivit Statements of Facts" filed by Johnnie Lamont Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Johnnie Lamont Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
November 1, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Castania, M)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Document requesting additional time filed by Johnnie Lamont Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - the court ORDERS the clerk to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia where venue is proper. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/19/2021. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
October 19, 2021 Case transferred to District of Columbia. File transmitted electronically. (Indig, A.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Marshal, United States Marshall Aaron and United States Marshall Michale filed by Johnnie Lamont Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
October 14, 2021 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for initial review. (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. United States Marshal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Lamont Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshall Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshall Michale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?