Essick v. Simmons et al
Petitioner: Anthony Mark Essik and Anthony Mark Essick
Respondent: Carlos Simmons, Claude Jarman, S. Stephen, Nurse Davis and Nurse Bunn
Case Number: 5:2021ct03318
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Change of Address filed by Anthony Mark Essick. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/released. Copy of judgment, order and notice of appellate rights sent to Anthony Essik at Pender Correctional Institution. (Poole, A)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to advise the court of his new address and for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/12/2021. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The court DISMISSES the action without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to advise the court of his new address and for failure to prosecute. The court DENIES AS MOOT plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying fees or costs (D.E. 1). The clerk shall close the case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/10/2021. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Plaintiff was released from custody. (Poole, A)
November 10, 2021 Case Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for initial review. (Poole, A)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of order sent to Anthony Essik at Pender Correctional Institution. (Poole, A)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Poole, A)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 11/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., on 10/22/2021. Copy of order sent to plaintiff and DPS. (Poole, A)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Mark Essik at Pender Correctional Institution. (Poole, A)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle. Case Number 1:21-cv-00812. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/20/2021; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for Eastern District of North Carolina. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 10/20/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 10/20/2021.]
October 19, 2021 CASE REFERRED for Screening, Motion Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 10/20/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTHONY MARK ESSICK. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 10/20/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees by ANTHONY MARK ESSICK. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 10/20/2021.] Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct docket event. (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essick v. Simmons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Mark Essik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Mark Essick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carlos Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Claude Jarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Stephen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nurse Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nurse Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?