Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC v. Atticus, LLC
Plaintiff: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc.
Defendant: Atticus, Inc.
Interested Party: Helm Argo US, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00006
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Patent
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a miscellaneous action and reassigned James C. Dever III, United States District Judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:21-MC-1-D. No further filing shall be made in 5:21-CV-6-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/5/2021. (Rudd, D.)
January 6, 2021 Case Reassigned to District Judge James C. Dever, III. District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan no longer assigned to the case. (Rudd, D.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle. Case Number 8:20-mc-00108. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. See order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/28/2020. (MLM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Helm Argo US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Email))(Eidson, Bradley). Added MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case on 12/28/2020 (LNR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Scott Eidson on behalf of Helm Argo US, Inc. (Eidson, Bradley) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/16/2020. (MLM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 ***TERMINATED; contacted counsel; summons(es) not issued in miscellaneous cases.***PROPOSED summons to be issued by Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. (Waggoner, Dennis) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (LNR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 15, 2020 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new miscellaneous case, Receipt No. 113A-17664344 for $49 paid. (Waggoner, Dennis) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Under Local Rule 1.09(a) by Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. (Waggoner, Dennis) Modified text on 12/15/2020 (AG). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC v. Atticus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Helm Argo US, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Conneely
Represented By: Bradley Scott Eidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atticus, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Dowd
Represented By: Robert J. Scheffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc.
Represented By: Hari Santhanam
Represented By: Russell Levine
Represented By: Clay Wheeler
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?