Lenovo (United States) Inc. v. Liberty Patents
Plaintiff: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Defendant: Liberty Patents
Case Number: 5:2021cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Rehan M. Safiullah on behalf of Liberty Patents. (Safiullah, Rehan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zachariah S. Harrington on behalf of Liberty Patents. (Harrington, Zachariah)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of Liberty Patents. (Thompson, Larry)
January 26, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
January 26, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Liberty Patents. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.)
January 26, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including March 15, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/26/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Liberty Patents. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Siddoway, Peter)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter D. Siddoway on behalf of Liberty Patents. (Siddoway, Peter)
January 15, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Liberty Patents served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Wharton, Jacob)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Liberty Patents. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. regarding #1 Complaint, (Proposed Summons). (Wharton, Jacob)
January 5, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond M. Bennett on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Bennett, Raymond)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Hayden J. Silver, III on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Silver, Hayden)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Group Limited, Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Lenovo Group Limited (Hong Kong) for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Wharton, Jacob)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacob S. Wharton on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Wharton, Jacob)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Patents ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5805993.), filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 6,535,959, #2 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 6,920,573, #3 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 7,493,612, #4 Exhibit Complaint Civil Action No. 2:20-cv-314) (Wharton, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenovo (United States) Inc. v. Liberty Patents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Patents
Represented By: Rehan M. Safiullah
Represented By: Zachariah S. Harrington
Represented By: Larry D. Thompson
Represented By: Peter D. Siddoway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Jacob S. Wharton
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Hayden J. Silver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?