Nationwide General Insurance Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2021cv00113
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company served on U.S. Attorney, U.S. Marshals Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney General on April 6, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipts) (Garrett, Glen)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Notice filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet JS-44. (Garrett, Glen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Notice filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint Summons issued to General Counsel for U.S. Marshals Service. (Garrett, Glen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint Summons issued to US Attorney for EDNC. (Garrett, Glen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Notice filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint Summons issued to US Attorney General. (Garrett, Glen)
March 11, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
March 11, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court.Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Garrett, Glen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Glen H. Garrett on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Garrett, Glen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5920399.), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Garrett, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Glen H. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?