UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $10,421.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $10,421.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 5:2021cv00128
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/30/2021. (Stouch, L.)
March 30, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #9 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #4 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #1 Complaint, Attachment DE 1-1, #1 Complaint, 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #6 Ex Parte Motion t, 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Stouch, L.)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED SEALED Document: (Selected Participants Only)by Fesak, Matthew (available to: Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) regarding #9 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #4 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #1 Complaint, Attachment DE 1-1, #1 Complaint, 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #6 Ex Parte Motion t. (Fesak, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED Memorandum in Support (Selected Participants Only)by Fesak, Matthew (available to: Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) regarding #9 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #4 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #1 Complaint, Attachment DE 1-1, #1 Complaint, 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #6 Ex Parte Motion t. (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove the word 'Proposed' pursuant to #12 Order (Stouch, L.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #4 Ex Parte Motion to Seal #1 Complaint, Attachment DE 1-1, #1 Complaint, 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #8 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #6 Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Fesak, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Fesak, Matthew (available to: Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) regarding 7 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove the word 'Proposed' sealed pursuant to #12 Order (Stouch, L.).
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 SEALED Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 3/19/2021 (Stouch, L.). Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove the word 'Proposed' pursuant to #12 Order (Stouch, L.).
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding #1 Complaint, Corrected Exhibit A. (Fesak, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED Ex Parte Motion to Seal #1 Complaint, Attachment DE 1-1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 3/19/2021 (Stouch, L.). Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove the word 'Proposed' pursuant to #12 Order (Stouch, L.).
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Warrant) (Fesak, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $10,421.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 SEALED - Exhibit A - Declaration of SA Matthew Futch, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 3/16/2021 to temporarily seal Attachment #1 pending the Court's ruling on a motion to seal (Stouch, L.). Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove the word proposed pursuant to #12 Order (Stouch, L.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $10,421.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,421.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?