Burgess v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ricky Lane Burgess
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2021cv00131
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for USMS Process Receipt and Return served on Commissioner of Social Security on 4/9/2021. (Waddell, K.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for USMS Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 4/8/2021. (Waddell, K.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by US Marshal Service as to US Attorney's Office; US Attorney served on 4/8/2021 with answer due 6/7/2021. (Waddell, K.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals Service Forms) (Waddell, K.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Ricky Lane Burgess. (Waddell, K.)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and issue the Summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal shall serve the Summons and Complaint on the Defendant. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/19/2021. (Waddell, K.)
March 19, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Waddell, K.)
March 19, 2021 Remark - Copy of the #4 Order and file stamped copies of the complaint, summonses, financial disclosure statement and notice of appearance forwarded to the US Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ricky Lane Burgess (Piemonte, George)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by George C. Piemonte on behalf of Ricky Lane Burgess. (Piemonte, George)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Ricky Lane Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 285 Forms) (Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lane Burgess
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?