Allen et al v. MetLife et al
Plaintiff: Jay K. Allen and Kathy R Allen
Defendant: L3Harris Technologies, Inc., Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC, Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co. and MetLife
Case Number: 5:2021cv00174
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Sellers, N.)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #18 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiffs have up to and including June 21, 2021, within which to respond to the Motions to Dismiss #8 #14 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/11/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kathy R Allen. (Sellers, N.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Electronic Service, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jay K. Allen. (Sellers, N.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jay K. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Consent to Electronic Service, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. of Filing of File-Stamped Notice of Removal to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit File-stamped Notice to State Court) (McKnight, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal regarding Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Company filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se parties Jay K. Allen and Kathy R Allen have consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on these parties via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Sellers, N.)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Sellers, N.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Hawkins, Amanda)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Hawkins, Amanda)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda S. Hawkins on behalf of Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Hawkins, Amanda)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., Corporate Parent Mercer LLC, Corporate Parent Mercer Consulting Group, Inc. for Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Fulton, Shana)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 5/17/2021. Sent to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE Washington, DC 20019-6760 and Jay K. Allen 2526 Poole Road Raleigh, NC 27610-2820 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Shana L. Fulton on behalf of Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Fulton, Shana)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Johnson Plan bates-stamped 1-76, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 11.10.15 letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 11.27.15 Johnson Conversion letter) (McKnight, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by MetLife identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by MetLife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan, #2 Exhibit B - 03.22.18 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 11.27.15 Letter) (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file Notice of Self-Representation sent to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE Washington, DC 20019-6760 and Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road Raleigh, NC 27610-2820 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (McKnight, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. from Wake Co. Superior Court, case number 21CVS03637. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5988964), filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (McKnight, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. MetLife et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay K. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy R Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3Harris Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC
Represented By: Amanda S. Hawkins
Represented By: Shana L. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?