Masters v Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Masters and Rita Masters
Cross Defendant: Rose Acre Farms Inc.
Cross Claimant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00246
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 31 Rose Acre Farms ANSWER to #22 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Rose Acre Farms Inc.. (Robinson, William)
July 23, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Timothy H. Barnes on behalf of Robert Masters. (Barnes, Timothy)
July 23, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Timothy H. Barnes on behalf of Rita Masters. (Barnes, Timothy)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/19/2021. (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael Malone on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Malone, J.)
July 9, 2021 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Robinson, William)
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 Rose Acre Farms ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Rose Acre Farms Inc.. (Robinson, William)
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Burke on behalf of Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Burke, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher A. Page on behalf of Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Page, Christopher)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Rose Acre Farms Inc. by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Page, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rose Acre Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Robinson, William)
June 23, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
June 23, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Rose Acre Farms, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time #21 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including July 9, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/23/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Extension of Time by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Robinson, William)
June 22, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #20 Stipulation. Extensions of time to answer require leave of court. This document should have been filed as a motion with a proposed order attached. Please re-file as a motion. (Sellers, N.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Dorothy M. Gooding on behalf of Rose Acre Farms Inc.. (Gooding, Dorothy)
June 8, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by William C. Robinson on behalf of Rose Acre Farms Inc.. (Robinson, William)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts. Case Number 1:21-cv-10583. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 Case Electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of North Carolina. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Vieira, Leonardo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: Order to Transfer Venue re #13 Stipulation filed by Rita Masters. (Vieira, Leonardo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION To Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Rita Masters. (Barnes, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc. (Zarski, Monika) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Transfer of Venue in the Alternative filed by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Young, Tyler) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Transfer of Venue in the Alternative filed by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Young, Tyler) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Transfer of Venue in the Alternative by Rose Acre Farms Inc.(Young, Tyler) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Young, Tyler) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler A. Young on behalf of Rose Acre Farms Inc (Young, Tyler) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Milano on behalf of Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc (Milano, Sean) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certification)(Zarski, Monika) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc, Rose Acre Farms Inc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc, Rose Acre Farms Inc Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8718020 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rita Masters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 6/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters v Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Masters
Represented By: Timothy H. Barnes
Represented By: J. Michael Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Masters
Represented By: Timothy H. Barnes
Represented By: J. Michael Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rose Acre Farms Inc.
Represented By: Tyler A. Young
Represented By: Dorothy M. Gooding
Represented By: William C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Burke
Represented By: Christopher A. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?