5Star Life Insurance Co. et al v. Hammond et al
Plaintiff: Armed Forces Benefit Association and 5Star Life Insurance Co.
Defendant: Stephen Hammond and Diane Hammond
Case Number: 5:2021cv00271
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION to Deposit Funds , for Discharge, and for Dismissal. (Sellers, N.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Diane Hammond (Kirby, John)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Diane Hammond. (Kirby, John)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by John M. Kirby on behalf of Diane Hammond. (Kirby, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION to Deposit Funds , for Discharge, and for Dismissal filed by 5Star Life Insurance Co., Armed Forces Benefit Association. (Dill, David)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Deposit Funds , for Discharge, and for Dismissal filed by 5Star Life Insurance Co., Armed Forces Benefit Association. (Dill, David)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 5Star Life Insurance Co., Armed Forces Benefit Association. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service (Stephen Hammond, as Personal Representative - Exhibit A), #2 Affidavit of Service (Stephen Hammond, in his individual capacity - Exhibit B), #3 Affidavit of Service (Diane Hammond - Exhibit C)) (Dill, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Armed Forces Benefit Association (Dill, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by 5Star Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent 5Star Financial, LLC for 5Star Life Insurance Co.. (Dill, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David Curry Dill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Dill, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diane Hammond, Stephen Hammond(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Hammond), Stephen Hammond(in his Individual Capacity). (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-6] Financial Disclosure Statement, [1-7] Financial Disclosure Statement. The Financial Disclosure statement is astand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Financial Disclosure Statement using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement. (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-3] Proposed Summons, [1-4] Proposed Summons, [1-5] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten PDF document. Failure to flatten (the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons) may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6111291.), filed by 5Star Life Insurance Co., Armed Forces Benefit Association. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 5Star Life Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Armed Forces Benefit Association Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Dill, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5Star Life Insurance Co. et al v. Hammond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armed Forces Benefit Association
Represented By: David Curry Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5Star Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: David Curry Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Hammond
Represented By: John M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?