Plummer v. Cumberland County Schools Board of Education
Plaintiff: Brandi Lynne Plummer
Defendant: Cumberland County Schools Board of Education
Case Number: 5:2021cv00303
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 10/13/2021. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/7/2021. (Collins, S.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brandi Lynne Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Whiteman, Andrew)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay these activities. Unless a party raises objection in filing due within 14 days from this date, the court stays the parties' scheduling conference activities pending decision on motion filed 8/20/21. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/3/2021. (Collins, S.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew O. Whiteman on behalf of Brandi Lynne Plummer. (Whiteman, Andrew)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Brandi Plummer as to #13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 9/13/2021. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant's memorandum in support should have been filed as a separate document entry rather than as an attachment to the motion to dismiss. The deputy clerk corrected the docket and the memorandum is now filed at DE14. No action on the part of counsel is required. (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cumberland County Schools Board of Education. (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cumberland County Schools Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Refiled at DE14- Corrected Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Unpublished Cited Decistions) (Green, Dalton) Modified on 8/27/2021 (Collins, S.).
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Dalton Blair Green on behalf of Cumberland County Schools Board of Education. (Green, Dalton)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 **REFILED AT #13 ** MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cumberland County Schools Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Unpublished Decisions cited) (Green, Dalton) Modified on 8/27/2021 (Collins, S.).
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cumberland County Schools Board of Education (Green, Dalton)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Dalton Blair Green on behalf of All Defendants. (Green, Dalton)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Lynne Plummer. Cumberland County Schools Board of Education served by certified mail on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Collins, S.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cumberland County Schools Board of Education. (Summons issued at intake.) (Rudd, D.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Brandi Lynne Plummer. (Rudd, D.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Brandi Lynne Plummer. (Rudd, D.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cumberland County Schools Board of Education (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number RAL086228), filed by Brandi Lynne Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. Cumberland County Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Lynne Plummer
Represented By: Andrew O. Whiteman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Dalton Blair Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?