Davis v. City of Fayetteville
Plaintiff: Bianca Davis
Defendant: City of Fayetteville
Case Number: 5:2021cv00319
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeremy Daniel Locklear on behalf of City of Fayetteville. (Locklear, Jeremy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann Herlocker Smith on behalf of City of Fayetteville. (Smith, Ann)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Fayetteville (Smith, Ann)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/3/2021. (Sellers, N.)
August 30, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 27, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #5 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Sellers, N.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by Bianca Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Refund Order) (Richberg, Shayla)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Fayetteville. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 12, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the first document to initiate a civil action is to be a complaint, notice of removal, motion to proceed in forma pauperis or petition. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bianca Davis (Richberg, Shayla)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of Fayetteville ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6182750.), filed by Bianca Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Richberg, Shayla)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Appearance filed by Shayla Christine Richberg on behalf of Bianca Davis. (Richberg, Shayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Fayetteville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Davis
Represented By: Shayla Christine Richberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fayetteville
Represented By: Ann Herlocker Smith
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Locklear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?