Lee et al v. Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Shelia Y. Lee and R.K.N.
Defendant: Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2021cv00374
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shelia Y. Lee. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 10/21/2021. (Collins, S.) Modified on 10/21/2021 to indicate that Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.(Collins, S.).
October 21, 2021 SECOND Notice regarding 3 Notice of Self-Representation, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, WITH PROPOSED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff did not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, regarding privacy protection identifying the minor child's name. A party waives the federal rule privacy protection by filing the documents without redaction. For additional information, refer to the Privacy Notice located under the Self Representation section of the court's website (www.nced.uscourts.gov). The proposed complaint and notice of self representation have been placed under temporary seal to allow plaintiff to take corrective action. (Collins, S.)
September 20, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
September 20, 2021 Notice regarding 3 Notice of Self-Representation, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff did not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, regarding privacy protection identifying the minor child's name. A party waives the federal rule privacy protection by filing the documents without redaction. For additional information, refer to the Privacy Notice located under the Self Representation section of the court's website (www.nced.uscourts.gov). The proposed complaint and notice of self representation have been placed under temporary seal to allow plaintiff to take corrective action. (Collins, S.)
September 17, 2021 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Rudd, D.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Shelia Y. Lee. (Rudd, D.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Shelia Y. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) Modified on 9/17/2021 to temporarily seal [DE #1-1] Complaint due to the fact that it contains minor child's name. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Y. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.K.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?