Peregoy v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: Doris Peregoy
Defendant: Vernon Stewart, Donald E Harrop and Suzanne Matthews
Case Number: 5:2021cv00401
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Vernon Stewart (Shields, Kathryn)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Suzanne Matthews (Shields, Kathryn)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Donald E Harrop (Shields, Kathryn)
November 3, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
November 3, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (Waddell, K.)
November 3, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including December 13, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/3/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Donald E Harrop, Suzanne Matthews, Vernon Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn H. Shields on behalf of Donald E Harrop, Suzanne Matthews, Vernon Stewart. (Shields, Kathryn)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Peregoy. Vernon Stewart served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Budd, Joseph)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Peregoy. Donald E Harrop served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Budd, Joseph)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Suzanne Matthews. (Waddell, K.)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Doris Peregoy regarding #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons (Matthews). (Budd, Joseph)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald E Harrop, Vernon Stewart. Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Waddell, K.)
October 1, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Proposed Summons, [1-2] Proposed Summons, [1-3] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the proposed summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
October 1, 2021 Notice to Counsel: No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed for defendant Suzanne Matthews. (Waddell, K.)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Douglas Budd on behalf of Doris Peregoy. (Budd, Joseph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris Peregoy (Budd, Joseph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald E Harrop, Suzanne Matthews, Vernon Stewart ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6256336.), filed by Doris Peregoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (Harrop), #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (Matthews), #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (Stewart), #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit Verification of Complaint) (Budd, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peregoy v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Peregoy
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Stewart
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E Harrop
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Matthews
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?