Taylor v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Latrell Taylor
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00407
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Process Receipt and Return - Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/19/2021. (Waddell, K.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return - US Attorney served on 10/26/2021; answer due 12/25/2021. (Waddell, K.)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return - US Attorney General served on 10/20/2021. (Waddell, K.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals Service Forms) (Waddell, K.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Latrell Taylor. (Waddell, K.)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed byUS Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 10/7/2021. (Waddell, K.)
October 7, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (Waddell, K.)
October 7, 2021 Remark - Filed-stamped copies of #4 order, summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Latrell Taylor (Hall, Charlotte)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Latrell Taylor. (Hall, Charlotte)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Latrell Taylor. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrell Taylor
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?