Milhaus Development LLC v. Rangewater Real Estate, LLC
Plaintiff: Milhaus Development LLC
Defendant: Rangewater Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00408
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Rangewater Real Estate, LLC answer due 12/12/2021. Counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on counsel for Defendant. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/12/2021. (Collins, S.)
November 12, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Order regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Milhaus Development LLC. (Groseclose, Mathew)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Collins, S.)
November 10, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Milhaus Development LLC. (Groseclose, Mathew)
November 5, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance on behalf of attorney John Posthumus for non-district by Mathew R. Groseclose on behalf of Milhaus Development LLC. (Groseclose, Mathew) Modified on 11/5/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Milhaus Development LLC served on Linda Banks on 10/21/2021. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 22, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Rangewater Real Estate, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 Notice filed by Milhaus Development LLC regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Summons. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Milhaus Development LLC regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Mathew R. Groseclose on behalf of Milhaus Development LLC. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Milhaus Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent Milhaus, LLC for Milhaus Development LLC. (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 TRADEMARK REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on October 7, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Milhaus Development LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rangewater Real Estate, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6264314.), filed by Milhaus Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit Trademark Assignment) (Groseclose, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milhaus Development LLC v. Rangewater Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milhaus Development LLC
Represented By: Mathew R. Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rangewater Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?