Becton v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Marie A. Becton
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00449
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Proof of Service filed by Marie A. Becton served on US Attorney on 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - US Attorney General, #2 Proof of Service - Acting Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Plaintiff regarding #7 Summons Issued as to USA and duty to serve. Sent to Marie A. Becton at 915 Dandridge Dr. Fayetteville, NC 28303 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Marie A. Becton. (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Notice - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marie A. Becton regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Marie A. Becton (Sellers, N.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - This case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 5:21-CV-449-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/3/2021. (Waddell, K.)
November 4, 2021 Notice of Social Security Case Filing (Sellers, N.)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/3/2021. (Copy of order and forms sent to Marie A. Becton, 915 Dandridge Dr., Fayetteville, NC 28303 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL088225 and $2.00 receipt number RAL088226), filed by Marie A. Becton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Claim, #2 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Marie A. Becton. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becton v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie A. Becton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?