Lands v. City of Raleigh
Plaintiff: Patrick D Lands
Defendant: City of Raleigh
Case Number: 5:2021cv00491
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address filed by Valerie L. Bateman filed by on behalf of Patrick D Lands. (Bateman, Valerie)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Raleigh (Tejada, Alice)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Alice J. Tejada on behalf of City of Raleigh. (Tejada, Alice)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Patrick D Lands. All Defendants. (Bateman, Valerie)
December 2, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should correct the law firm and address information on the docket by emailing the correct information to NCED-ATTORNEY-UPDATE@nced.uscourts.gov. Counsel should also correct her email address so that the correct email address appears on the docket. (Stouch, L.)
December 2, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number 417-6332407. (Rudd, D.)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 Notice filed by Patrick D Lands regarding #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet. (Bateman, Valerie)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-491-BO. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-174-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/30/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 30, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 30, 2021 Notice to Counsel: This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Payment of the civil filing fee is due upon case initiation. Payments can be, made in the form of cash, checks, or credit cards and paid at the clerk's office during regular business hours. Credit card payments can be made over the telephone to the clerk's office during regular business hours. Also, Pay.gov is an additional credit card option that allows the filer to pay filing fee contemporaneously with the case opening in CM/ECF. (See Section V.D(l)(a) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Patrick D Lands (Bateman, Valerie)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Valerie L. Bateman on behalf of Patrick D Lands. (Bateman, Valerie)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to City of Raleigh on 11-29-2021 by Patrick D Lands. Waiver of Service due by 12/29/2021. (Bateman, Valerie)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Raleigh, filed by Patrick D Lands. (Bateman, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lands v. City of Raleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D Lands
Represented By: Valerie L. Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Raleigh
Represented By: Alice J. Tejada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?