Burkhardt v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Carl Burkhardt
Defendant: United States of America and U.S. Department of Treasury
Case Number: 5:2021cv00517
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Stouch, L.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt (Stouch, L.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 Notice - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Stouch, L.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice - Proposed Summonses filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Stouch, L.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 Document: Clarification of Previously Submitted Petition filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter) (Stouch, L.)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/5/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to Stanley Carl Burkhardt at Butner Medium II - F.C.I., P.O. Box 1500, Butner, NC 27509. (Stouch, L.)
January 5, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Stouch, L.)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The documents in the above captioned matter, received by the court on 12/17/2021 are deficient as detailed herein. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/20/2021. (Copy of order and forms sent to Stanley Carl Burkhardt, Reg. No. 20092-034 at Butner Medium II - F.C.I., P.O. Box 1500, Butner, NC 27509 via US Mail.) (Rudd, D.)
December 20, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Rudd, D.)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Stanley Carl Burkhardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A- Facts - Supporting document of complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Statement from the U.S. Dept. of Treasury, #4 Exhibit C- For Joint Tax Refund Offsets Only, #5 Exhibit E- Inmate Inquiry, #6 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)
December 17, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Stanley Carl Burkhardt. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
December 17, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhardt v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Carl Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?