United States of America v. Pfeifer
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Deryke Matthew Pfeifer
Case Number: 5:2021hc02133
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Deryke Matthew Pfeifer (available to: Respondent Deryke Matthew Pfeifer, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna) Modified to remove "proposed" on 8/9/2021 (Poole, A).
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 Document: Butner decision of forensic staff 4246 (A) filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 Document: Prior Case History filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 Document: Right to have open file/Public has right to know filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Deryke Matthew Pfeifer regarding false imprisonment. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Deryke Matthew Pfeifer regarding Government's fear of trial. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Document: Criminal Conspiracy Complaint filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION of Appeal of court order filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 Copy of email from Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Danger Study filed by Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner as to Dr. Hans Stelmach (Allen, Sonya)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya M. Allen on behalf of Deryke Matthew Pfeifer. (Allen, Sonya)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER appointing Federal Public Defender to represent respondent and appointing mental health examiner. GRANTING #3 Motion to Seal. The court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal, whether such documents are produced by government evaluators, independent examiners appointed by order of this court, or other mental health professionals. The court will set this matter for hearing upon receipt of the psychiatric or psychological report prepared pursuant to 4247(c). Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 6/25/2021. (Poole, A)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of United States of America. (Petre, Genna)
June 24, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report. (Poole, A)
June 23, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: All counsel appearing on behalf of a party should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Edwards, S.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Deryke Matthew Pfeifer (available to: Respondent Deryke Matthew Pfeifer, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 against Deryke Matthew Pfeifer, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deryke Matthew Pfeifer
Represented By: Sonya M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?