United States of America v. Dobson
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Jeremy M. Dobson
Case Number: 5:2021hc02137
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - GRANTING #9 Motion to Withdraw and GRANTING #9 Motion to Dismiss. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/16/2021. (Poole, A)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, , MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Jeremy M. Dobson (available to: Respondent Jeremy M. Dobson, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna)
August 13, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #9 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Poole, A)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner as to Dr. Hans Stelmach (Allen, Sonya)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya M. Allen on behalf of Jeremy M. Dobson. (Allen, Sonya)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER appointing Federal Public Defender to represent respondent, appointing additional mental health examiner, and GRANTING #3 Motion to Seal. The court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal, whether such documents are produced by government evaluators, independent examiners appointed by order of this court, or other mental health professionals. The court will set this matter for hearing upon receipt of the psychiatric or psychologicalreport prepared pursuant to 4247(c). Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/2/2021. (Poole, A)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED (Selected Participants Only) Forensic Report received as to Jeremy M. Dobson (available to: Respondent Jeremy M. Dobson, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna) Modified on 7/2/2021 to remove the word "proposed". (Poole, A).
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of United States of America. (Petre, Genna)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 against Jeremy M. Dobson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
June 25, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report. (Poole, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeremy M. Dobson
Represented By: Sonya M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?