UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kozohorsky
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: James Kozohorsky
Case Number: 5:2021hc02164
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4248
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to James Kozohorsky (available to: Respondent James Kozohorsky, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic report by Dr. Mark E. Hastings), #2 (Confidentiality Agreement of Dr. Mark E. Hastings), #3 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Mark E. Hastings)) (Royster, Joshua)
September 15, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE regarding #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Kozohorsky. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
September 15, 2021 Remark: Response Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. (Lopez, R.)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/7/2021. Copy mailed to petitioner via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Examination filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 9/8/2021. (Lopez, R.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 17 Notice filed by James Kozohorsky Notice of Response to the Court. (Craven, Joseph)
September 3, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION (the Court authorize Dr. Amy Phenix to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of her examination) for Examination filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pratesi, Holly)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (United States' Response to Respondent's Pro Se Motion for Clarifying and Summary Judgment [SIC] Petition (D. E. 13) and Pro Se Motion for Injunctive Relief (D. E. 14)) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pratesi, Holly)
September 3, 2021 Motions Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #14 PRO SE MOTION for Injunctive Relief; #13 PRO SE MOTION for Clarifying and Summary Judgment; #15 RESPONSE in Opposition. (Lopez, R.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - At the direction of the Court, Counsel for the Respondent in this matter is directed to respond to the Governments Motion for Examination (D.E.16) no later than September 10, 2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 9/3/2021. (Lopez, R.)
September 3, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #16 MOTION (the Court authorize Dr. Amy Phenix to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of her examination) for Examination. (Lopez, R.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 PRO SE MOTION for Injunctive Relief; and/or any other relief due under United States Constitution filed by James Kozohorsky. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) Modified on 8/25/2021 to add "pro se" to the text (Lopez, R.).
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION for Clarifying and Summary Judgment filed by James Kozohorsky. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Bredenberg on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bredenberg, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appoint Expert. The court hereby GRANTS respondent's motion and APPOINTS Dr. Plaud, a licensed psychologist, as an additional mental health examiner selected by respondent, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b) and 5(c) of Amended Standing Order 13-SO-2 (Standing Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 8/5/2021. (Lopez, R.)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 Corrected MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by James Kozohorsky. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joseph Plaud, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Craven, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud filed by James Kozohorsky. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joseph Plaud, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Costello, Halerie)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Halerie M. Costello on behalf of James Kozohorsky. (Costello, Halerie)
August 5, 2021 DISREGARD - NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Corrected Motion to Appoint Expert - Pursuant to District Judge Richard E. Myers II Practice Preferences, counsel shall email proposed orders in a word processing format to Documents_Judge_Myers@nced.uscourts.gov. (Lopez, R.) Modified on 8/5/2021 - This motion will be referred to Magistrate Judge Meyers. (Lopez, R.).
August 5, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #10 Corrected MOTION to Appoint Expert . (Lopez, R.)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to James Kozohorsky (available to: Respondent James Kozohorsky, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Dawn Graney, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner), #2 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Dawn Graney)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2021 to remove the word proposed. (Lopez, R.).
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph H. Craven on behalf of James Kozohorsky. (Craven, Joseph)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The court hereby APPOINTS Mark E. Hastings, Ph.D., CSOTP, a licensed psychologist, as a mental health examiner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b) and 5(b) of Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 7/29/2021. Copy sent to Dr. Hastings via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - This case is a proceeding by the government under 18 U.S.C. 4248 for the civil commitment of respondent as a sexually dangerous person. The courts Standing Order on such cases, No. 13-S0-2 (E.D.N.C. 21 Oct. 2013) (Standing Order), shall govern proceedings in this case. The Office of the Federal Public Defender is DIRECTED to provide representation in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 7/29/2021. Copy sent to FPD via email. (Lopez, R.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Holly P. Pratesi on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pratesi, Holly)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Royster, Joshua)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against James Kozohorsky, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Jamie Hersant), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kozohorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Holly P. Pratesi
Represented By: Joshua B. Royster
Represented By: Michael D. Bredenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Kozohorsky
Represented By: Halerie M. Costello
Represented By: Joseph H. Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?