UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Martin
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Ryan Martin
Case Number: 5:2021hc02192
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4248
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Ryan Martin by Dr. Joseph Plaud (available to: Respondent Ryan Martin, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 Confidentiality Agreement of Dr. Joseph Plaud) (Costello, Halerie) Modified on 10/28/2021 to remove the word "proposed" from the docket text. (Castania, M)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Ryan Scott Martin (available to: Respondent Ryan Martin, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic report by Dr. Harry M. Hoberman), #2 (Confidentiality Agreement of Dr. Harry M. Hoberman), #3 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Harry M. Hoberman)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 10/18/2021 to remove the word "proposed." (Indig, A.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - GRANTING #11 Motion to Appoint Expert and APPOINTS Dr. Plaud, a licensed psychologist, as an additional mental health examiner selected by Respondent, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b) and 5(c) of Amended Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/17/2021. Copy sent to Dr. Plaud via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
September 17, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #11 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud. (Indig, A.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud filed by Ryan Martin. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joseph Plaud, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Costello, Halerie)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - GRANTING #9 Motion. Dr. Arnold may conduct an examination of Respondent as soon as practicable and Respondent shall fully cooperate in the examination. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/13/2021. (Indig, A.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION (the Court authorize Dr. Dale Arnold to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of her examination) Examination filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The court hereby APPOINTS Harry M. Hoberman, Ph.D., a licensed psychologist, as a mental health examiner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and4248(b) and 5(b) of Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/7/2021. Counsel is reminded to read the entire order for critical dates and deadlines. Copy of order sent to Dr. Hoberman via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - This case is a proceeding by the Government under 18 U.S.C. 4248 for the civil commitment of Respondent as a sexually dangerous person. The court's Standing Order on such cases, No. 13-SO-2, shall govern proceedings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/7/2021. Counsel is reminded to read the entire order for critical dates and deadlines. (Indig, A.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Ryan Martin (available to: Respondent Ryan Martin, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Justin Rigsbee, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner), #2 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Justin Rigsbee)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 9/3/2021 to remove the word "proposed." (Indig, A.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Halerie M. Costello on behalf of Ryan Martin. (Costello, Halerie)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Bredenberg on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bredenberg, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Dennis M. Duffy on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Duffy, Dennis)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Royster, Joshua)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against Ryan Martin, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Trent Evans), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua)
August 31, 2021 Case Submitted to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for initial case management order. (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dennis M. Duffy
Represented By: Michael D. Bredenberg
Represented By: Joshua B. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Martin
Represented By: Halerie M. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?