UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Irving
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Stefan Irving
Case Number: 5:2021hc02196
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4248
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Stefan Irving (available to: Respondent Stefan Irving, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic report by Dr. Fabian M. Saleh), #2 (Confidentiality Agreement of Dr. Fabian M. Saleh), #3 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Fabian Saleh)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 10/21/2021 - to remove the word "proposed".(Lopez, R.).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The court hereby appoints Joseph Julian Plaud, Ph.D., a licensed psychologist, as a mental health examiner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b), and Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/27/2021. (Lopez, R.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Examination (the Court authorize Dr. Jeffrey Davis to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of his examination). For good cause shown, this court GRANTS the government's motion. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/22/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional information. (Lopez, R.)
September 17, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud. (Lopez, R.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud filed by Stefan Irving. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joseph Plaud, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Craven, Joseph)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Examination (the Court authorize Dr. Jeffrey Davis to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of his examination) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Golden, Lauren)
September 16, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #8 MOTION for Examination (the Court authorize Dr. Jeffrey Davis to conduct a clinical interview of Respondent as part of his examination). (Lopez, R.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Stefan Irving (available to: Respondent Stefan Irving, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Dawn Graney, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner), #2 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Dawn Graney)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 9/7/2021 - to remove the word proposed. (Lopez, R.).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court hereby APPOINTS Fabian M. Saleh, M.D., a licensed psychiatrist, as a mental health examiner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b) and 5(b) of Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/3/2021. Copy sent to Dr. Saleh via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This case is a proceeding by the government under 18 U.S.C. 4248 for the civil commitment of respondent as a sexually dangerous person. The court's Standing Order on such cases, No. 13-S0-2 (E.D.N.C. 21 Oct. 2013) ("Standing Order"), shall govern proceedings in this case. The Office of the Federal Public Defender is DIRECTED to provide representation in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/3/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional information. Copy sent to FPD via electronic mail. (Lopez, R.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph H. Craven on behalf of Stefan Irving. (Craven, Joseph)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Lauren A. Golden on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Golden, Lauren)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Royster, Joshua)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against Stefan Irving, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Jamie Hersant), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua)
September 2, 2021 Case Submitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for case management order. (Lopez, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lauren A. Golden
Represented By: Joshua B. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stefan Irving
Represented By: Joseph H. Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?