UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Luberts
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Henry Luberts
Case Number: 5:2021hc02205
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Evaluate Respondent Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Henry Luberts - Status Report from FMC Butner Regarding Evaluation (available to: Respondent Henry Luberts, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Petre, Genna)
November 9, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Evaluate Respondent Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b). (Poole, A)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner as to Dr. Hans Stelmach (Allen, Sonya)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya M. Allen on behalf of Henry Luberts. (Allen, Sonya)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER appointing Federal Public Defender to represent respondent and appointing additional mental health examiner. GRANTING #4 Motion to Seal. The court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal, whether such documents are produced by government evaluators, independent examiners appointed by order of this court, or other mental health professionals. The court will set this matter for hearing upon receipt of the psychiatric or psychological report prepared pursuant to 4247(c). Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/27/2021. (Poole, A)
September 21, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #6 MOTION for an Evaluation of Respondent Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246(b). (Poole, A)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for an Evaluation of Respondent Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246(b) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Respondent's Competency by the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Henry Luberts (available to: Respondent Henry Luberts, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 against Henry Luberts, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
September 15, 2021 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Respondent's Competency by the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii, #4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report. (Poole, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Luberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Luberts
Represented By: Sonya M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?