UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Hodge
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Michael Joseph Hodge
Case Number: 5:2021hc02217
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4248
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Michael Joseph Hodge (available to: Respondent Michael Joseph Hodge, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic report by Dr. Luis B. Rosell), #2 (Confidentiality Agreement of Dr. Luis B. Rosell), #3 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Luis B. Rosell)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 11/23/2021 to remove the word "proposed" from the docket text. (Castania, M)
November 23, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports. (Castania, M)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for examination by Dr. Zinik. Petitioner shall filed Dr. Zinik's evaluation within 14 days after examination. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/8/2021. (Castania, M)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION FOR EXAMINATION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pratesi, Holly)
November 2, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #11 MOTION FOR EXAMINATION. (Castania, M)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appoint Expert - The court appoints Joseph Julian Plaud, Ph.D. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/21/2021. Copy served via US Mail: Joseph Julian Plaud, Ph.D., Applied Behavioral Consultants, LLC, 8805 Tamiami Trail, North, Number 243, Naples, FL 34108-2525 USA. (Castania, M)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The court appoints Luis Rosell, Psy.D., as a mental health examiner. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/21/2021. Copy served via US Mail: Luis Rosell, Psy.D., 114 E. Monroe St., #109, Mt. Pleasant, IA 52641. (Castania, M)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Michael Joseph Hodge (available to: Respondent Michael Joseph Hodge, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Katherine E. Sunder, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner), #2 (Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Katherine E. Sunder)) (Royster, Joshua) Modified on 10/18/2021 to remove the word "proposed." (Castania, M)
October 18, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #7 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud. (Castania, M)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Joseph Plaud filed by Michael Joseph Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joseph Plaud, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Costello, Halerie)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Halerie M. Costello on behalf of Michael Joseph Hodge. (Costello, Halerie)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER appointing counsel and setting deadlines and other provisions. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/13/2021. (Copy to the Office of the Federal Public Defender via email.) (Castania, M)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Petre, Genna)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Holly P. Pratesi on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pratesi, Holly)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Royster, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against Michael Joseph Hodge, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Jamie Hersant), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Represented By: Holly P. Pratesi
Represented By: Joshua B. Royster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Joseph Hodge
Represented By: Halerie M. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?