Clewis v. Worley et al
Plaintiff: James Levie Clewis
Defendant: Lt. Andrew Worley, Capt. Dawn Battle and Sgt. Lee
Case Number: 5:2022ct03009
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Change of Address (Mountain View Correctional Institution) filed by James Levie Clewis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Levie Clewis. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
February 17, 2022 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Lopez, R.)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/14/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff and NCDPS via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
February 14, 2022 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II for initial review. As soon as review is completed and order will enter and the next appropriate steps will be taken. (Lopez, R.)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Lopez, R.)
February 11, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Lopez, R.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Lopez, R.)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 1/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/7/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by James Levie Clewis. (Indig, A.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dawn Battle, Sgt. Lee and Andrew Worley filed by James Levie Clewis. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clewis v. Worley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Levie Clewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Andrew Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Dawn Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?