Johnson v. State of North Carolina
Plaintiff: Richard Lewis Johnson
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2022ct03012
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/9/2022. Copy of order, judgment, and appellate rights information mailed to plaintiff via U.S. Mail at address as noted in judgment. (Castania, M)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice for failure to comply with order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/9/2022. Copy served via US Mail: Richard Lewis Johnson 0212278, Tabor Correctional Institution, 4600 Swamp Fox Hwy West, Tabor City, NC 28463. (Castania, M)
February 7, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding order of deficiency. (Indig, A.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND you must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $402.00. Responses due by 2/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/11/2022. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Tabor Correctional. (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (in letter form) against State of North Carolina filed by Richard Lewis Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lewis Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?