McArthur v. Cumberland County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Gilbert Lamont McArthur
Defendant: Cumberland County Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2022ct03043
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 3/7/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
March 7, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for initial review. (Indig, A.)
March 7, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 3/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/25/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Gilbert Lamont McArthur. (Indig, A.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Cumberland County Detention Center filed by Gilbert Lamont McArthur. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 23, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding order of deficiency. (Indig, A.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND you must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $402.00. Response due by 2/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/27/2022. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Plaintiff at the Cumberland County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (in letter form) against Cumberland County Detention Center filed by Gilbert Lamont McArthur. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McArthur v. Cumberland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Lamont McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?