Brewer v. Ishee et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brewer
Defendant: Todd E. Ishee, John M. Godfrey, Richard D. Ball and Nancy Erin
Case Number: 5:2022ct03045
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file Notice of Appeal, and plaintiff has until March 30, 2022 to file his notice of appeal. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/16/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Brewer. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
March 14, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Notice of Appeal. (Poole, A)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/28/2022. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff was cautioned that failure to correct the noted deficiencies may result in the dismissal of his action without prejudice. Plaintiff failed to correct the deficiencies within the time period required. Thus, the court DISMISSES this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/28/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
February 25, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for failure to comply with order of deficiency. (Poole, A)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $402.00. Responses due by 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., on 1/28/2022. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Brewer at Dan River Prison Work Farm. (Poole, A)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard D. Ball, Nancy Erin, John M. Godfrey and Todd E. Ishee filed by Kenneth Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Ishee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd E. Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Erin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?