Johnson v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Jarrod Johnson
Defendant: Shanticia E. Hawkins, Shirley Bennett, Barbra Watson Hargrove, Earth Reid and North Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 5:2022ct03050
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 3/30/2022 via email regarding Earth Reid. Response due by 5/30/2022. (Castania, M)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend to add copy of grievance. Plaintiff may proceed with his Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Reid. The court DISMISSES all other defendants along with plaintiff's request for a sentence reduction. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/30/2022. Copy served via US Mail: Brandon Jarrod Johnson 0692627, Warren Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 728, Norlina, NC 27563. (Castania, M)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 24, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. Case also submitted for initial review. (Indig, A.)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
February 23, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Jarrod Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 2/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/4/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Plaintiff at Warren Correctional. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Brandon Jarrod Johnson. (Indig, A.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shirley Bennett, Barbra Watson Hargrove, Shanticia E. Hawkins, North Carolina Department of Corrections and Earth Reid filed by Brandon Jarrod Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jarrod Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanticia E. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Watson Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earth Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?