McGriff El v. Small Claims Court et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Lee McGriff El
Defendant: Small Claims Court, Magistrate William Bland and D.A. Matthew L. Delbrige
Case Number: 5:2022ct03402
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert B Jones
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/9/2022. Copy sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
December 9, 2022 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II for initial review. (Indig, A.)
December 8, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #6 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Lopez, R.)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Lopez, R.)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 12/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/28/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (on the form) filed by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (on the form) against all defendants, filed by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - The complaint and application to proceed without prepayment of fees are not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected papers within twenty-one (21) days from the filing of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/15/2022. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Responses due by 12/6/2022.) (Lopez, R.)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Wayne County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. (Indig, A.)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Writ of Mandamus) against William Bland and Small Claims Court filed by Emmanuel Lee McGriff El. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGriff El v. Small Claims Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Lee McGriff El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Claims Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate William Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.A. Matthew L. Delbrige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?